McCaughan, Jennifer Anne (CPSO#: 111349)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jan 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 26 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER ANNE MCCAUGHAN may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. MCCAUGHAN is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. MCCAUGHAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MCCAUGHAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MCCAUGHAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. MCCAUGHAN ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. MCCAUGHAN ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 25 Mar 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018