McCausland, Joan (CPSO#: 20965)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994