McClelland, Bruce (CPSO#: 69586)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Mar 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
20 bell farm road
Barrie ON  L4M 6E4
Phone: (705) 737-0444
Fax: (705) 737-5958
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRUCE MCCLELLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCLELLAND is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1995 to 31 Aug 1995
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 1995 to 30 Sep 1995
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2010