McClelland, Bryan Anthony (CPSO#: 30101)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 22 Oct 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 22 Oct 1990