McCloskey, Deborah Ann (CPSO#: 66559)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone: (705) 326-2244
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roland Sing Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sing ( CPSO# 67015 )
Dr. D. McCloskey ( CPSO# 66559 )

Business Address:
210 - 2330 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1T 0A2
Phone Number: (416) 335-1717

Business Address:
89 Queensway West
Suite 604
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (416) 551-7070


Corporation Name: Deborah McCloskey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sing ( CPSO# 67015 )
Dr. D. McCloskey ( CPSO# 66559 )

Business Address:
105 - 119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone Number: (705) 326-2244

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH ANN MCCLOSKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCLOSKEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998