McCloy III, Robert Andrew (CPSO#: 93902)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Surgery
St. Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 31 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT ANDREW MCCLOY III may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCLOY III is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 28 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 06 Jan 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2015