McCluskey, Stuart Andrew (CPSO#: 68138)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
General Division
200 Elizabeth Street
Eaton South 3 - 405
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5164
Fax: (416) 340-3698
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stuart A. McCluskey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. McCluskey ( CPSO# 68138 )

Business Address:
The Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Eaton South 3 - 405
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-5134

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STUART ANDREW MCCLUSKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCLUSKEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1999