McColl, Lindsay Anne (CPSO#: 103639)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
NEOMO Medical
Suite 205
2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone: (705) 586-3601
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lindsay Anne McColl Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. McColl ( CPSO# 103639)

Business Address:
NEOMO Medical
205 - 2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone Number: (705) 586-3601

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDSAY ANNE MCCOLL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCOLL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2016