McColl, Mary Ellen (CPSO#: 67204)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: Rogers, Mary Ellen Mccoll (used until: 19 Sep 1993 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: c/o Dr. Martha Clendenning 30 Chatham Street North Blenheim, ON N0P 1A0
Date Received: 05 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014