McComas, Alan John (CPSO#: 41669)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Durham, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: McMaster Health Sciences Centre Room 3V48 1200 Main Street West Hamilton, ON L8N 3Z5
Date Received: 21 May 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jul 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014