McConnell, Carmine Gayle (CPSO#: 52785)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 1997