McConnell, Natalie Rita (CPSO#: 67813)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Names: Krisko, Natalie Rita (used until: 03 Feb 2000 )     McConnell, Natalie Rita (used until: 26 Jul 1995 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4C - 65 Donly Drive North
Simcoe ON  N3Y 0C2
Phone: (519) 428-3060
Fax: (519) 428-1325
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalie McConnell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. McConnell ( CPSO# 67813 )

Business Address:
Unit 4 C
65 Donly Drive
Simcoe ON  N3Y 0C2
Phone Number: (519) 428-3060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATALIE RITA MCCONNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCONNELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1996