McConvey, Michael Joseph (CPSO#: 58452)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
121 Wellington Street West
Barrie ON  L4N 1L2
Phone: (705) 728-5536
Fax: (705) 728-4885
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael J. McConvey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. McConvey ( CPSO# 58452 )

Business Address:
206 - 121 Wellington Street West
Barrie ON  L4N 1L2
Phone Number: (705) 728-5536

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOSEPH MCCONVEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCONVEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1988