McCormack, Enid Maureen (CPSO#: 51526)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 28 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jul 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2012