McCormack, Robert Gordon (CPSO#: 31544)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Jan 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Apr 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2015