McCormick, Anna Marie (CPSO#: 67014)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Nov 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Children's Hospital
of Eastern Ontario
Rehab PSU
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2831
Fax: (613) 738-4893
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Rehabilitation Centre
505 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-7350
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anna McCormick Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. McCormick ( CPSO# 67014 )

Business Address:
The Children's Hospital
of Eastern Ontario
Rehab PSU
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA MARIE MCCORMICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCORMICK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1995