McCormick, Charles Clifford Kirkpatrick (CPSO#: 51093)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Apr 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Apr 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 5Y8
Phone: (905) 358-0171 Ext. 53386
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Catharines Site- NHS
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles McCormick Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. McCormick ( CPSO# 51093 )

Business Address:
Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 5Y8
Phone Number: (905) 358-0171

Business Address:
Welland County General Hospital
63 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 732-6111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Dec 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES CLIFFORD KIRKPATRICK MCCORMICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCORMICK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 1984