McCormick, Duncan Skye (CPSO#: 60543)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Feb 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Feb 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Board Certified Specialist in
Allergy and Clinical Immunology
PO Box 99900 GK 653 215
RPO Seton
Calgary AB  T3M 2A1
Phone: (403) 879-6157

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. D. McCormick Rural Route 4 Listowel ON N4W 3G9 Tel: 403-879-6157
Date Received: 17 Nov 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
British Columbia
USA - Ohio
USA - Virginia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DUNCAN SKYE MCCORMICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCORMICK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Clinical Immunology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 1989