McCormick, Lindsay Anne (CPSO#: 87384)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Apr 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Apr 2016

Summary

Former Name: Sit, Lindsay Anne (used until: 20 Apr 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Upstate Medical Center State Univ of N Y, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721 2000
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Sit Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2013


Corporation Name: Lindsay McCormick Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. McCormick ( CPSO# 110229)
Dr. L. McCormick ( CPSO# 87384 )

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2420

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 20 Oct 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDSAY ANNE MCCORMICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCORMICK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2016