McCourt, Francine Dawn (CPSO#: 76201)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Sep 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2003

Summary

Former Name: Davis, Francine Dawn (used until: 05 Jul 2001 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Sep 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCINE DAWN MCCOURT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCOURT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 28 Feb 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Mar 2002 to 31 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2003