McCoy, Blathnaid Marie (CPSO#: 91541)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2021

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Pediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7500
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jul 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 28 Aug 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Apr 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Blathnaid Marie McCoy may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  University  of  Toronto,  in which Dr. McCoy holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  seven  years  from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or  when Dr. McCoy  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating  that Dr. McCoy's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional  conduct,  or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about  Dr.  McCoy's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  July  1,  2014.   In  accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended  by  the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on June 30, 2021.