McCoy, Stephen Norman (CPSO#: 60456)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS Record Storage and Retrieval Services 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Telephone: 1-888-563-3732 or 416-398-0638
Date Received: 12 Dec 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jan 2015