McCready, David Ross (CPSO#: 32902)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Oct 1981

Summary

Former Name: Mc Cready, David Ross (used until: 06 May 1982 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Suite 3 130
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-6510
Fax: (416) 946-4429
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David McCready Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. McCready ( CPSO# 32902 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
3-130 - 610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-6510

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ROSS MCCREADY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCREADY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1981