McCready, Michael John (CPSO#: 75452)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 03 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 29 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Jul 2000 to 21 Jul 2000
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 07 May 2001 to 03 Jun 2001
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jul 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2001