McCuaig, Bradley Michael (CPSO#: 64942)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 209
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone: (519) 579-5311
Fax: (519) 579-2339
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bradley McCuaig Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. B. McCuaig ( CPSO# 64942 )

Business Address:
Suite 209
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 579-5311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRADLEY MICHAEL MCCUAIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCUAIG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Infectious Diseases

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993