McCuaig, Wendy Susette (CPSO#: 64943)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: McCurdy, Wendy Susette (used until: 08 Jun 1993 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
18 Pine Street
Suite 400
Kitchener ON  N2H 5Z8
Phone: 519-954-3648
Fax: 519-954-3600
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wendy McCuaig Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. W. McCuaig ( CPSO# 64943 )

Business Address:
Suite 400
18 Pine Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5Z8
Phone Number: (519) 570-0090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WENDY SUSETTE MCCUAIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCUAIG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993