McCullagh, David Joseph (CPSO#: 104354)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  18 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 9055255140
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ashleigh McCullagh-Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. McCullagh ( CPSO# 104354)
Dr. A. McCullagh-Cheung ( CPSO# 104954)

Business Address:
Medica One
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
3rd Floor
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone Number: (905) 662-3885

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JOSEPH MCCULLAGH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MCCULLAGH is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. MCCULLAGH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MCCULLAGH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MCCULLAGH shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MCCULLAGH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MCCULLAGH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 18 Dec 2017.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 18 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Dec 2017