McCullagh, Scott Robert (CPSO#: 62581)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Dec 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Regional Rehabilitation Centre
300 Wellington St. North
Hamilton ON  L8L 0A4
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 40813
Fax: (905) 577-8233
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Health Care Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
Phone: 905-522-2941
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT ROBERT MCCULLAGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCULLAGH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 01 Sep 1998
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1991