McCulloch, Amy Eleanor (CPSO#: 95286)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: (905) 521-5092
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amy McCulloch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. McCulloch ( CPSO# 95286 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9

Business Address:
690 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A4
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMY ELEANOR MCCULLOCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCULLOCH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2014