McCulloch, Donna Marie (CPSO#: 62001)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 2000


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2000