McCulloch, Kristin Kathleen (CPSO#: 103273)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
Department of Family Medicine
Chatham Campus PO Box 2030
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone: (519) 352-6400
Electoral District: 01

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Sep 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTIN KATHLEEN MCCULLOCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCULLOCH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 17 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 16 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Jul 2017 to 14 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2017