McCulloch, Pamela Ruth (CPSO#: 51063)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 5734 Country Lane Fort Wayne IN 46804 United States
Date Received: 18 May 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Indiana

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 26 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 May 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016