McCune, Marcie Lee (CPSO#: 70021)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519) 273-4100 Ext. 4
Fax: (519) 273-3208
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marcie McCune Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. McCune ( CPSO# 70021 )

Business Address:
24 Huron Street West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2

Business Address:
98 Shipley Street
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0

Business Address:
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 273-4100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
South Huron Hospital Exeter
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARCIE LEE MCCUNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCUNE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2001