McCusker, Patricia Jane (CPSO#: 56992)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 18 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Hematological Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 2002