McDermott, Colleen Dawn (CPSO#: 77961)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 8-815
700 University Avenue
M5G 1Z5
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: 416-586-4800 Ext. 6490
Fax: 416-586-4453
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

70 Yorkville Ave
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto ON  M5R 1B9
Canada
Phone: 647-343-0207
Fax: 647-343-0277
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COLLEEN DAWN MCDERMOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDERMOTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2010