McDermott, Gerard Francis (CPSO#: 60236)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 27 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jul 2012