McDermott, Pamela Douglas (CPSO#: 32397)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
329 Pine Ridge Rd
Huntsville ON  P1H2J3
Phone: (705) 571 1186
Fax: (705) 789-1406
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pamela McDermott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. McDermott ( CPSO# 32397 )

Business Address:
329 Pine Ridge Road
Huntsville ON  P1H 2J3
Phone Number: (705) 789-2842

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAMELA DOUGLAS MCDERMOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDERMOTT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1981