McDermott, Thomas Michael (CPSO#: 24754)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 03 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2014


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Box 2010 95 Meridian Street Haileybury, ON P0J 1K0
Date Received: 02 Jun 2014


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2014