McDonald, Andrew Charles (CPSO#: 57918)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Mar 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Mar 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 88083
Fax: (416) 480-4704
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew C. McDonald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. McDonald ( CPSO# 57918 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room H464
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4037

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW CHARLES MCDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 1987