McDonald, Anne Jane (CPSO#: 93272)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Little Current Medical Associates
PO Box 549
15 Meredith St East
Little Current ON  P0P1K0
Phone: (705) 368-2450
Fax: (705) 368-2480
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anne J. McDonald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. McDonald ( CPSO# 93272 )

Business Address:
2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone Number: (705) 522-3380

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Room 2300
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7147

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
North Shore Health Network Blind River
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE JANE MCDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONALD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012