McDonald, Charles Robert Joey (CPSO#: 86479)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
50 Alliance Blvd
Barrie ON  L4M 5K3
Phone: 705-728-8778
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: 705-728-9802
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: 705-728-9802
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joey McDonald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. McDonald ( CPSO# 86479 )

Business Address:
50 Alliance Boulevard
Barrie ON  L4M 5K3
Phone Number: (705) 728-8778

Business Address:
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 30 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES ROBERT JOEY MCDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012