McDonald, Charlotte Gabrielle (CPSO#: 70209)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6170
Fax: (519) 646-6058
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Charlotte McDonald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. McDonald ( CPSO# 70209 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare London
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6170

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLOTTE GABRIELLE MCDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONALD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2000