McDonald, Donald John (CPSO#: 17860)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 09 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Limited 13 - 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1 800 775 0093 emial: tina@recordsregistry.ca
Instructions: Contact above
Date Received: 22 Jan 2015


Address: Records Management Limited Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Phone: 1-800-775-0093 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 05 Nov 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 02 Dec 1961 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Dec 2014