McDonald, Graeme Alexander (CPSO#: 33246)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 27 Oct 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 15 Sep 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1982
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Nov 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 1987
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 27 Oct 1994