McDonald, Hector (CPSO#: 60277)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Mar 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Mar 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1655 Kilborn Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1H 6M7
Phone: (613) 739-5437
Fax: (613) 739-5432
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hector McDonald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. McDonald ( CPSO# 60277 )

Business Address:
1655 Kilborn Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1H 6M7
Phone Number: (613) 739-5437

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HECTOR MCDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONALD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1993