McDonald, Jane Christine (CPSO#: 30942)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 30 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 29 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jun 2004