McDonald, Jane Ellen (CPSO#: 60670)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Oct 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
394 Guelph Line
Burlington, Ontario
Burlington ON  L7R 3L4
Phone: (905) 333-1553
Fax: (905) 333-1558
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANE ELLEN MCDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONALD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 1990