McDonald, Jennifer Kelly (CPSO#: 95773)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: Shea, Jennifer Kelly (used until: 24 Sep 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chronic Pain Fellowship
Department of Anesthesia
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St., McL 2-405
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: 416-603-5118
Fax: 416-603-6494
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medsport Ottawa
320 March Road, Suite 300
Ottawa ON  K2K 2E3
Canada
Phone: 613-763-1510
Fax: 613-270-0982
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

The Ottawa Hospital Rehab Centre
Division of Physical Medicine
and Rehabilitation
505 Smyth Road, Room 1200
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-7350 Ext. 75591
Fax: 613-739-6864
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER KELLY MCDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONALD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016