McDonald, Joanne Elizabeth (CPSO#: 52616)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients can obtain a copy of their medical record by emailing Dr. McDonald at: dr.joanne.e.mcdonald@gmail.com
Date Received: 08 Jun 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Rheumatology Effective: 23 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014