McDonald, Joanne Leslie (CPSO#: 59389)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 25 Mar 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Mar 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2003

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: March 25, 2003
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Joanne Leslie McDonald is not a member of the College and her certificate of registration
has expired because of the information provided to the College by the Medical Council of
Canada that Dr. McDonald has not passed the Medical Council of Canada Qualifying Examination
(MCCQE) and therefore does not hold the Licentiate Certificate of the Medical Council of
Canada (LMCC).